Mathews, Nicole Megan (CPSO#: 83738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Phone: (905) 878-6793
Fax: (905) 878-6711
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE MEGAN MATHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEWS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2005 to 21 Oct 2005
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 08 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006