Mathur, Avdesh Narain (CPSO#: 22625)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:Bihar University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Sudbury Cardiac Research Tel: (705) 522-7232
Date Received: 15 Sep 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2014