Mathur, Mohit (CPSO#: 108572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Feb 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 19 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
200 Elizabeth Street
North 840
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4999
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHIT MATHUR may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MATHUR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MATHUR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MATHUR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MATHUR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MATHUR ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. MATHUR ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2016 to 18 Apr 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 19 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jan 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2018