Mathur, Shobhit (CPSO#: 104335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Baroda University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Medical Imaging Centre
399 Bathurst St.
3rd Floor, Room 3MC-410
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5800 Ext. 3634
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Shobhit Mathur may practise medicine only as required by the clinical
                  fellowship program in diagnostic radiology in which Dr. Mathur is
                  enrolled in the Department of Medical Imaging, University of Toronto;

            2.    Dr. Mathur shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-patients of
                  a  clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where   Dr.   Mathur   is  properly  practising  medicine  and  to  which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Mathur shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on June 30, 2018.