Matic, Damir (CPSO#: 69204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
E2 646
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8557
Fax: (519) 685-8405
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Matic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Matic ( CPSO# 69204 )

Business Address:
E2-646 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8557

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAMIR MATIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2001