Matino, Davide (CPSO#: 105317)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Perugia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 13 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 14 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Laboratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2016