Matlow, Anne Geela (CPSO#: 53339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 13 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE GEELA MATLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATLOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1985