Matsell, Douglas George (CPSO#: 54612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
K4 - 150 Division of Nephrology
B C Children's Hospital
4480 Oak Street
Vancouver BC  V6H 3V4
Phone: (604) 875-2272
Fax: (604) 875-3649

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS GEORGE MATSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATSELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1992