Matsuba, Kevin Kenji (CPSO#: 62281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Corvallis Radiology P C
Corvallis OR  97330
United States
Phone: (541) 452-8008
Fax: (541) 758-3713

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - California
USA - Oregon

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN KENJI MATSUBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATSUBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991