Matsui, Doreen Miyako (CPSO#: 55630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8268
Fax: (519) 685-8156
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOREEN MIYAKO MATSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATSUI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1989