Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Matsuo, Jill Masako (CPSO#: 70407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Family Physicians
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 425-9000
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jill Matsuo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Matsuo ( CPSO# 70407 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Family Physicians
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 425-9000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL MASAKO MATSUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATSUO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998