Matsuura, Ian Makoto (CPSO#: 66865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
46-E Peninsula Center Dr, #309
Rolling Hills Estates CA  90274
United States
Phone: (310) 560-1183
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3330 Lomita Blvd
Torrance CA  90505
United States
Phone: 3103259110
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
USA - California
USA - Colorado
USA - Hawaii
USA - Illinois
USA - Texas
USA - Wisconsin
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN MAKOTO MATSUURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATSUURA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2008