Mattar, Kamal (CPSO#: 85480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
307-6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone: (905) 356-7321
Fax: (289) 296-0236
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kamal Mattar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mattar ( CPSO# 85480 )

Business Address:
307 - 6453 Morrision Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 356-7321

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMAL MATTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 21, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)