Mattar, Nabih (CPSO#: 64669)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabih Mattar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Te: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017