Matteliano, Andrea Alessandro (CPSO#: 99994)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Apr 2013 to 01 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Nov 2015 to 06 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Dec 2015 to 15 Jan 2016
Elective Trainee - Urology

McMaster University, 16 Jan 2016 to 07 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2016