Matthews, Benjamin Dan (CPSO#: 69331)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998