Matthews, Thomas Wayne (CPSO#: 53897)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2009