Mattia, Alicia Marie (CPSO#: 95647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pop. Health Reseach Institute
Stroke Medicine, Office C4 - 6C
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 17 Jul 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICIA MARIE MATTIA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MATTIA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. MATTIA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MATTIA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MATTIA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MATTIA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MATTIA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018