Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Matuk, Aileen Ruth (CPSO#: 22728)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000