Matukas, Larissa Maria (CPSO#: 76454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Rm 2-040 CC
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 2946
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARISSA MARIA MATUKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATUKAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2006