Matveyev, Aliaksandr (CPSO#: 87222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Minsk State Medical Institute, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aliaksandr Matveyev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Matveyev ( CPSO# 87222 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIAKSANDR MATVEYEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATVEYEV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2014