Matyas, Miklos (CPSO#: 67919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Phone: (613) 727-3132
Fax: (613) 727-3075
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Matyas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matyas ( CPSO# 67919 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Centre
501 - 1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Phone Number: (613) 727-3132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIKLOS MATYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATYAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999