Mauceri, Nella (CPSO#: 62368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 100
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 773-1325
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mauceri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mauceri ( CPSO# 62368 )

Business Address:
Oak Ridges Medical
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NELLA MAUCERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUCERI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991