Maudsley, Robert Frederick (CPSO#: 21817)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2000