Maunder, Robert Gordon (CPSO#: 53927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Psychiatry
9th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3200
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Maunder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maunder ( CPSO# 53927 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
9th Floor, Room 915
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GORDON MAUNDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUNDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1986