Maurice, Michael Jude (CPSO#: 64020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
749 King Street West
Suite 302
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E4
Phone: (519) 584-0180
Fax: (519) 584-0182
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Maurice Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maurice ( CPSO# 64020 )
Dr. B. Chapman ( CPSO# 59796 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
749 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E4
Phone Number: (519) 884-0180

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JUDE MAURICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAURICE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992