Maw, Jennifer Lesley (CPSO#: 63576)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 01 Nov 1996
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001