Mawardi, Mohammad Haytham Mohammad (CPSO#: 80441)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2004 to 29 Feb 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2007 to 28 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011