Maximous, Emad Fahim (CPSO#: 81942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 45561
Fax: (905) 323-3800
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emad Maximous Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Maximous ( CPSO# 81942 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health Systems
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMAD FAHIM MAXIMOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXIMOUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008