Maxted, Grant Royden (CPSO#: 51055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 48000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Downsview Endoscopy Clinic
201- 1635 Lawrence Ave. W.
Downsview ON  M6L3C9
Canada
Phone: (416) 630-7388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Freilich Dental Associates
55 St. Clair Ave. W. #125
Toronto ON  M4V2Y7
Canada
Phone: (416) 789-5335
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Crescent Oral Surgery
Suite 400
9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-8806
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Canada
Phone: (905) 763-1107
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Herzig Eye Clinic
Suite 210
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-2020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 2E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-7864
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 201
1490 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-0424
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 203
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 754-2022
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

300 York Mills Road
North York ON  M2L 2Y5
Canada
Phone: (416) 391-4452
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 300
1131A Leslie Street
North York ON  M3C 3L8
Canada
Phone: (416) 527-2263
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 505
3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6A 3B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 256-9500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 602
1235 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3K4
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-3444
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 31
70 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto ON  M3R 1B9
Canada
Phone: (647) 343-0207
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 200
4610 Hwy 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Ontario Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 634-0001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grant Maxted Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maxted ( CPSO# 51055 )

Business Address:
400 - 9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Phone Number: (905) 889-8006

Business Address:
602 - 1235 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3K4

Business Address:
31 - 70 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto ON  M3R 1B9

Business Address:
302 - 1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6

Business Address:
935 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 789-5335

Business Address:
1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 785-7864

Business Address:
201 - 1490 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone Number: (416) 461-0424

Business Address:
300 York Mills Road
North York ON  M2L 2Y5
Phone Number: (416) 391-4452

Business Address:
505 - 3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3B2

Business Address:
101 - 133 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 0A6

Business Address:
1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
1089 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1N 4E4

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Business Address:
210 - 131 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5R 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 929-2020

Business Address:
186 St George Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2N3
Phone Number: (416) 920-4244

Business Address:
400 - 145 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 451-5855

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRANT ROYDEN MAXTED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXTED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1983