Maxwell, Cynthia Vivianne (CPSO#: 76532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Harvard Medical School, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Power Generation Building
Suite 3-901
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3229
Fax: (416) 586-5992
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA VIVIANNE MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002