Maxwell, Ian Edwin Johnson (CPSO#: 96146)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit M10 15 Elizabeth Street Orangeville ON L9W 3X3
Date Received: 24 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2016