May, Andre Boyd (CPSO#: 68987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46611
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Owen Street
Barrie ON  L4M 3G7
Canada
Phone: (705) 730-0286
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
P O Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: 705-526-1300
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

The Simcoe Clinic
#2-279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4N7T9
Canada
Phone: 705-728-8860
Fax: 705-737-4733
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre B. May Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. May ( CPSO# 68987 )

Business Address:
1112 St Andrews Drive
P O Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 725-7716

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Ontario Addiction Treatment Centre
20 Owen Street
Barrie ON  L4M 3G7
Phone Number: (705) 737-1565

Business Address:
Unit 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE BOYD MAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1997