May, Donna Lyn (CPSO#: 64922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone: (905) 457-3458
Fax: (905) 595-1115
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch St.
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905 494 2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.L. May Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. May ( CPSO# 64922 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 457-3458

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA LYN MAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1992