May, John Douglas (CPSO#: 58318)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. D. May Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 16 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Dawson Road Medical Group 83 Dawson Road Guelph, ON N1H 1B1
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015