Maybee, John Douglas (CPSO#: 55642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3312
Fax: (905) 721-4337
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Maybee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maybee ( CPSO# 55642 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS MAYBEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYBEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1986