Mayberry, Thomas Richard (CPSO#: 27537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
483953 Sweaburg Road
R.R. 4
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3J7
Phone: (519) 485-3908
Fax: (519) 485-6469
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:30 p.m., November 15, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term,
            condition and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by
            Dr. Thomas Richard Mayberry:

                  (i)   Dr. Mayberry will successfully complete one on one instructions in
                        medical ethics with an instructor approved by the College, at his
                        own expense, within six months of the date of this Order.
                  
                  
            As from July 17, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Thomas Richard
            Mayberry, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mayberry
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Thomas Richard Mayberry has relinquished his prescribing privileges
                  with respect to the following drugs, substances and preparations set out
                  in the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and
                  summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                       X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)              X

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Nov 2017
Summary:

On November 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Thomas Richard Mayberry 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, 
would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonorable, or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Mayberry is a family physician practising in Ingersoll, Ontario. He received his certificate of 
registration authorizing  independent  practice  from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario (“the College) in 1975 and holds privileges at the Alexandra Hospital, the Tillsonburg 
District Memorial Hospital and the Woodstock General Hospital. 
 
On July 17, 2012, Dr. Mayberry signed an Undertaking, relinquishing his prescribing privileges 
with respect to narcotics, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, and benzodiazepines.   
 
2015 Prescribing of Alprazolam  
 
The College obtained Narcotics Monitoring System (“NMS”) data in relation to Dr. Mayberry 
for the period from May 22, 2014 to February 10, 2016 which revealed that two prescriptions for 
Alprazolam  0.5  mg,  90  tablets,  were  issued  on  April  9,  2015  and  on  September  29,  2015, 
respectively, to Patient A. The prescriptions were obtained from the pharmacy. 
 
Dr. Mayberry breached his Undertaking with the College as Alprazolam is a Benzodiazepine, a 
category of drugs that Dr. Mayberry is prohibited from prescribing.  
 
2015 Inquiries Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) Caution  
 
The facts in relation to penalty stated that in 2014, the College received Narcotics Monitoring 
System (“NMS”) information which revealed that Dr. Mayberry had prescribed contrary to his 
undertaking on seven occasions, including the following substances: Morphine, Oxycodone, 
Pentazocine, Ativan, Tylenol 3, Adderall and Concerta.  
 
On September 23, 2015, the ICRC considered the information and required Dr. Mayberry to 
attend the College to be cautioned in person with respect to this repeated prescribing of 
controlled substances in breach of his Undertaking with the College.   
 
2016 Investigation 
 
In response to the 2016 Investigation, Dr. Mayberry acknowledged that an error had occurred 
and that he was disappointed that the error occurred. There is no information with respect to any 
breaches of Dr. Mayberry’s Undertaking between September 29, 2015 and the present. 
 
Closure of Family Practice 
 
Dr. Mayberry intends to close his family practice on December 1, 2017. Following that time, Dr. 
Mayberry intends to provide anesthetic services 2-3 times per week at a local hospital.  He has 
found a physician to take over his family practice effective December 1, 2017. 
 
Disposition 
 
On November 15, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  the Registrar suspend Dr. Mayberry’s Certificate of Registration for a two month period, 
   effective December 1, 2017. 
-  the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Mayberry’s 
   Certificate of Registration: 
   -  Dr. Mayberry will successfully complete one-on-one instructions in medical ethics with 
      an instructor approved by the College, at his own expense, within six months of the date 
      of this Order. 
-  Dr. Mayberry appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Mayberry pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of 
   the date of this Order.

Hearing Date(s): November 15, 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 23, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)