Mayer, Kevin David (CPSO#: 93087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Highland Road West
Unit 4
Kitchener ON  N2M 3B5
Phone: (519) 576-1910
Fax: (519) 576-9791
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Mayer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mayer ( CPSO# 93087 )

Business Address:
Unit 4
100 Highland Road West
Kitchener ON  N2M 3B5
Phone Number: (519) 576-1910

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN DAVID MAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012