Mayman, David Jacob (CPSO#: 72204)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 2004