Mayo, Robert Earl (CPSO#: 52890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 McKee Road
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 5G3
Phone: (519) 627-0942
Fax: (519) 436-9982
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

712 Richmond Street
Chatham ON  N7M 5K4
Canada
Phone: (519) 359-0028
Fax: (519) 351-5842
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

70 Duke Street
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 5E4
Canada
Phone: (519) 627-0719
Fax: (519) 627-3573
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert E. Mayo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mayo ( CPSO# 52890 )

Business Address:
60 McKee Road
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 5G3
Phone Number: (519) 627-0942

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT EARL MAYO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1989