Mayrand, Serge (CPSO#: 61734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montreal General Hospital
1650 Cedar Avenue
D7-102
Montreal QC  H3G 1A4
Phone: (514) 934-8308
Fax: (514) 934-8547

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERGE MAYRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYRAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1992