Maytham, James Connery (CPSO#: 54398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jul 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
273 Main St E
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1A7
Phone: (519) 733-2318
Fax: (519) 733-2310
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

245 Talbot St W
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Canada
Phone: (519) 324-0078
Fax: (519) 324-0485
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

1011 Front St
La Salle ON  N9J 2A6
Canada
Phone: (519) 734-1565
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 05 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            [1 of 2]
            As from March 22, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. James Connery
            Maytham, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Maytham to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JAMES CONNERY MAYTHAM
                                          ("Dr. Maytham") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Maytham, certificate of registration number 54398, am a member of
                  the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (4)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for eighteen (18) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College,;
                  
                        (iii) Hold an initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations; 
                  
                        High Level Supervision
                  
                        (iv)  For two weeks, attend Dr. Maytham's family practice no less
                              than daily during those days that he is practicing primary
                              care for two weeks. During this time, the Supervisor will act
                              as the Most Responsible Physician.
                  
                        Moderate Level Supervision
                  
                        (v)   Further to the Supervisor's recommendation and subject to the
                              approval of the the College, Supervision shall be reduced to
                              a Moderate level of supervision. The frequency of visits will
                              be no less than weekly for four visits.
                  
                        Low Level Supervision
                  
                        (vi)  Further to the Supervisor's recommendation and subject to the
                              approval of the the College, Supervision shall be reduced to
                              a Low level supervision. The frequency of visits will be no
                              less than biweekly for a month, then monthly for two months
                              and bi-monthly thereafter.
                  
                        (vii) Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting during the periods of moderate and low level
                              supervision;
                  
                        (viii)Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (ix)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (x)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (xi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month and quarterly thereafter, or more frequently if the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of
                              practice.

                  (c)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        assessor, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (4)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: medical record
                              keeping and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (4)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)"). I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard. I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Maytham, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code:

                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maytham, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Maytham, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maytham, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              *     Dr. Maytham will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 18
                                    months.
                              *     Dr. Maytham will engage in professional education in
                                    record keeping.
                              *     Dr. Maytham's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the
                                    end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Maytham, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Maytham, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Maytham, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;

                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            [2 of 2]
            As from November 9, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. James Connery
            Maytham, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Maytham to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Maytham has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to
                  the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the
                  corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized
                  as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                             Relinquished      

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)                      X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)                      X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                                   X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)              X

            Monitored Drugs                            
            (from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term
             Care List of Monitored Drugs)                   X

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2011
Summary:

      The Committee accepted as true all of the facts set out in the Agreed Statement of Facts and 
Admission. Having regard to these facts, the Committee accepted Dr. Maytham’s admission and found 
that he committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  

      1. Dr. Maytham appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 

      2. The Registrar suspend Dr. Maytham’s certificate of registration for a period of 4 months 
commencing at 12:01 a.m. on May 1st, 2011. 

      3. Dr. Maytham pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date 
of this Order.  

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 25 Nov 2011
Hearing Date(s): March 8-10, 2011


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Jan 2009
Summary:

 On January 7, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Maytham has committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the 
 Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional, by writing a prescription in the name of a person whom he had 
 never seen, examined, spoken to or treated.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 that:

1.	Dr. Maytham appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
2.	Dr. Maytham pay to the College 
 costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.
3.	The results of this 
 proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 7 through to Januaray 9, 2009


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Sep 2007
Summary:

 On September 21, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Maytham to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the 
 Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee ordered the following penalty:

 1.                
   The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Maytham to appear before the panel to be 		reprimanded.
 
 
2.                  The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Maytham to pay to the College costs in 
 the 		amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.
 
3.                  The 
 Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the 		register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Connery Maytham to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 22, 2018:

-Dr. Maytham will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 18 months.
-Dr. Maytham will engage in professional education in record keeping.
-Dr. Maytham’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.