Mazagri, Rida Suleiman (CPSO#: 72129)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Oct 2000