Mazarova, Andrea (CPSO#: 93473)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
Department of Pediatric
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014