Mazengia, Getachew Demem (CPSO#: 90248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Jimma University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Mazengia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mazengia ( CPSO# 90248 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GETACHEW DEMEM MAZENGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZENGIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2009 to 23 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 24 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2011 to 08 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011