Mazer, Bruce David (CPSO#: 83586)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 26 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2015