Mazer, Cyril David (CPSO#: 51059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mazer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mazer ( CPSO# 51059 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5825

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYRIL DAVID MAZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1987