Maziak, Donna Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
6 N W 6364
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 74051
Fax: (613) 737-8668
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maziak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Maziak ( CPSO# 58433 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
6 N W 6364
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA ELIZABETH MAZIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1988