Mazloom, Fereshteh (CPSO#: 56690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: Farzan Nejad, Fereshteh (used until: 14 Oct 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian, Spanish

Education:University of Barcelona, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TAIBU Community Health Center
Unit 1
27 Tapscott Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y7
Phone: 416-644-3536
Fax: 416-644-0102
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERESHTEH MAZLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZLOOM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1988