Mazrani, Waseem (CPSO#: 87791)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Charing Cross Hospital Medical School, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 22 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 07 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2009